skip to content

Patchett-Marble, Ryan James

CPSO#: 95618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: 807-229-2672 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan Patchett-Marble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patchett-Marble ( CPSO# 95618 )

Business Address:
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-1740

Business Address:
26 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN JAMES PATCHETT-MARBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATCHETT-MARBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013