skip to content

Patasi, Beata

CPSO#: 92183

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Hungarian, Russian, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON  N7M 1L6
Phone: 18889306571
Fax: 18559672945 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Patasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Patasi ( CPSO# 92183 )

Business Address:
Good Doctors Medical
Unit 2
2956 Highway 69 N
Val Caron ON  P3N 1E3
Phone Number: (705) 805-0199

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEATA PATASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2010 to 11 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2012