skip to content

Pasyk, Ewa Anna

CPSO#: 91432

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Fax: (905) 545-6793 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Dundas Street East, Unit 4A
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: 905 232-0720
Fax: 905 232-0790
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ewa A. Pasyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EWA ANNA PASYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014