skip to content

Pasternak, Jesse David

CPSO#: 90625

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
10 En 214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4792
Fax: 416-340-3808 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jesse David Pasternak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pasternak ( CPSO# 90625 )

Business Address:
10 EN 214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4792

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSE DAVID PASTERNAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTERNAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2015