skip to content

Passos, Edward Martins

CPSO#: 94609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 381.9365 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Passos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: EDWARD PASSOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Passos ( CPSO# 94609 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD MARTINS PASSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015