skip to content

Passaperuma, Kavitha Nayanathara Hewa

CPSO#: 86588

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2153
Fax: (905) 883-2156 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Passaperuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Passaperuma ( CPSO# 86588 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2153

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAVITHA NAYANATHARA HEWA PASSAPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSAPERUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011