skip to content

Paskar, David Drew Adamson

CPSO#: 93427

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health - Richmond Hill Ho
Room 4021C
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 3030
Fax: 289-622-1497 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Oakville ON
Toronto ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 289-813-0211
Fax: 289-529-0251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health - Vaughan
Critical Care/Surgery
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212 x
Fax: 289-622-1497
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID DREW ADAMSON PASKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015