skip to content

Pasian, Sergio Giuntini

CPSO#: 87968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SERGIO GIUNTINI PASIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020