skip to content

Parveen, Nighat

CPSO#: 87175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Hospital
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301 Ext. 0
Fax: (416) 281-7465 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nighat Parveen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parveen ( CPSO# 87175 )

Business Address:
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIGHAT PARVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARVEEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008