skip to content

Parveen, Kazi Shahnaz

CPSO#: 96553

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2015
Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kazi Shahnaz Parveen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2016:

Dr. Parveen was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Parveen shall see patients no more than six (6) hours per day, and shall see no more than thirty (30) patients within the 6 hour work day.

• Dr. Parveen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

• Dr. Parveen will engage in professional education.

• Dr. Parveen’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.