skip to content

Parsons, Tiffany Dove

CPSO#: 100801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
417 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 1W8
Phone: (705) 671-3001 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. D. Parsons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Parsons ( CPSO# 100801)

Business Address:
417 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 671-3001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 31 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIFFANY DOVE PARSONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARSONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2018