skip to content

Parsons, Patricia Margaret

CPSO#: 91694

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 6970 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-1234
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. M. Parsons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Parsons ( CPSO# 91694 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARGARET PARSONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARSONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011