skip to content

Parry, Dominic James

CPSO#: 97147

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dominic Parry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018