Parray, Baynazir (CPSO#: 90609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 228
Fax: (905) 579-2021
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Parray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Parray ( CPSO# 90609 )

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAYNAZIR PARRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011