skip to content

Parnandi, Vandana Nikhila

CPSO#: 88837

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009 Ext. 201
Fax: (613) 841-0106 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

370 Kennedy Lane E
Orléans ON  K1E 3X5
Canada
Phone: (613) 830-2633
Fax: (613) 830-9910
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vandana Parnandi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parnandi ( CPSO# 88837 )

Business Address:
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Business Address:
370 Kennedy Lane East
Orleans ON  K1E 3X5
Phone Number: (613) 830-2633

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANDANA NIKHILA PARNANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNANDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010