skip to content

Parks, Kelly Elizabeth

CPSO#: 96879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
52 George Street
Warkworth ON  K0K 1K0
Phone: (705) 924-1239
Fax: (705) 924-2053 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 653-1140 Ext. 2143
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY ELIZABETH PARKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013