skip to content

Parker, Barbara Ellen

CPSO#: 29862

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barbara Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2022

Medical Records Location

Address: 275 Bagot St KIngston, ON K7L3G4
Date Received: 02 May 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2022