skip to content

Park, Sunkyu

CPSO#: 97250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
150 sherway drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: 416 259 6671
Fax: 416 521 4082 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNKYU PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2015