skip to content

Park, Si-Hyeong

CPSO#: 95869

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6362
Fax: 416-323-6375 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: SH PARK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Park ( CPSO# 95869 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital, 76 Grenville Street, 8th
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital, 600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SI-HYEONG PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019