skip to content

Park, Ingrid

CPSO#: 93689

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2011
EXPIRY DATE
08 Dec 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Booth St
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:18 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Sep 2010
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2021 Active
 1. Dr. INGRID PARK may practise neurology at Booth Neurology Clinic, in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College, and only in accordance with the Retraining Program approved by the College. 

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on December 8, 2022.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. PARK's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. PARK's practice, or

(iii) Dr. PARK is no longer enrolled in the Retraining Program, or

(iv) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site assessment of Dr. PARK's practice unsatisfactory.

Note: This certificate is issued on 18 July, 2011. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 08 December, 2022.