skip to content

Park, Elena

CPSO#: 97371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tamarkina, Elena (used until: 20 Jul 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENA PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Apr 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016