skip to content

Park, Diane Hyun Ju

CPSO#: 90528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: 519-578-3510 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 208
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: 519-742-0107
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chamberlain & Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 90485 )
Dr. D. Park ( CPSO# 90528 )

Business Address:
K-W CardioPulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardiac Rehabilitation Center
50 Bathurst Drive
Unit 1
Waterloo ON  N2V 2C5
Phone Number: (519) 885-9517

Business Address:
421 Greenbook Drive Unit 23B
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: 519-578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIANE HYUN JU PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016