skip to content

Pariser, Michael Robert

CPSO#: 91163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, 339 Windermere Road, London, ON, N6G 2V4
Date Received: 18 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016