Parikh, Rushi (CPSO#: 101103)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 17 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 17 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2017