skip to content

Kashani, Paria

CPSO#: 100458

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-30 Disera Dr
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: 905-771-7755
Fax: 905-771-7752 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge St
Aurora ON  L4G 6H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: (905) 841-9404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit A
13110 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 604-9522
Fax: (289) 870-2500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

491 Eglinton Ave W
Suite 301
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
County: 
Electoral District: 

2937 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 3N9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paria Kashani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kashani ( CPSO# 100458)

Business Address:
210-31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:04 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARIA KASHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2019