skip to content

Parfrey, Brendan Patrick

CPSO#: 85489

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Consultants
8 Rowan Street
PO Box 23042 RPO Churchill Square
St. John's NL  A1B 4J9
Phone: (709) 726-5311
Fax: (709) 726-1028

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Parfrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK PARFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARFREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 14 Aug 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
EL - Cardiology

Queen's University, 07 May 2007 to 03 Jun 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008