skip to content

Parfitt, Christopher Joseph

CPSO#: 31331

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1985