skip to content

Parekh, Shrenik Pratapbhai

CPSO#: 99705

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Dec 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Avalon Treatment Programs
58 Dawson rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Canada
Phone: 519-780-3883
Fax: 519-780-0453
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shrenik Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parekh ( CPSO# 99705 )

Business Address:
Avalon Treatment Program
58 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (519) 780-3883

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Suite D130
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014 Active
             Dr. Shrenik Pratapbhai Parekh may practise medicine independently in psychiatry
            and child and adolescent psychiatry, only.