skip to content

Parekh, Jaintheelal Mohanlal

CPSO#: 25390

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenestone Clinic
3rd Floor
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaintheelal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parekh ( CPSO# 25390 )
Dr. R. Parekh ( CPSO# 65708 )

Business Address:
5734 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAINTHEELAL MOHANLAL PAREKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAREKH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1972