skip to content

Pare, Rodolphe Albert

CPSO#: 21431

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Mar 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008