skip to content

Pardhan, Kaif

CPSO#: 93447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alim Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pardhan ( CPSO# 80839 )
Dr. K. Pardhan ( CPSO# 93447 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6


Corporation Name: Dr. Kaif Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan ( CPSO# 93447 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Cnetre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Science
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAIF PARDHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015