Parashar, Richa (CPSO#: 100520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone: 519-251-9499
Fax: 226-216-2508
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: 5192575111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parashar ( CPSO# 68704 )
Dr. R. Parashar ( CPSO# 100520)

Business Address:
Suite 258
1720 Howard Avenue, 400 Building
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 252-4049


Corporation Name: S. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parashar ( CPSO# 71996 )
Dr. R. Parashar ( CPSO# 100520)

Business Address:
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 948-7550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHA PARASHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARASHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015