skip to content

Parajian, Armen

CPSO#: 92997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Paraghamian, Armen (used until: 19 Nov 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 34808
Fax: 905-721-7784 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Armen Parajian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parajian ( CPSO# 92997 )

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:20 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARMEN PARAJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAJIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: January 12, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Armen Parajian was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Criminal harassment, contrary to section 264(2)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: December 22, 2021

SENTENCE: Suspended sentence with 3 years’ probation;

Probation conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour;
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court;
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or probation officer of any change in employment or occupation;
4. Report to a probation officer by phone within 48 hours and for the first 12 months thereafter as directed by their probation officer;
5. Cooperate with their probation officer, including signing any releases necessary for the probation officer to monitor compliance, and provide proof of compliance with any condition of the order to the probation officer upon request;
6. Attend any assessment, treatment, counselling as recommended by the probation officer;
7. Not to contact or communicate directly or indirectly with a list of individuals whose names are subject to a publication ban;
8. Not to attend within the boundaries of named streets, as the sole occupant of vehicle.