skip to content

Parai, Milton Sudipto

CPSO#: 87750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2016
EXPIRY DATE
05 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016