skip to content

Paradiso, Monica Celina

CPSO#: 94871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2016
EXPIRY DATE
25 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
120 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E2
Phone: 647-343-4115
Fax: 647-346-5015 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:11 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.  Monica Celina Paradiso may practise psychiatry at the Women's Mental
                  Health Clinic in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of registration will automatically expire on October 25,
                  2021. 

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Paradiso's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by  the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Paradiso's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on October 26, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before October 25, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.