skip to content

Paquin-Gobeil, Melanie

CPSO#: 91692

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office Location
170-1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: 613-596-5093
Fax: 613-225-3652 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melanie Paquin-Gobeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Paquin-Gobeil ( CPSO# 91692 )

Business Address:
1130 Morrison Drive
Suite 170
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 596-5093

Business Address:
Queensway Carlton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE PAQUIN-GOBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAQUIN-GOBEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014