skip to content

Papantony, Mary

CPSO#: 22227

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 2-Jul-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Alexandria, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1998