skip to content

Papadopoulos, Yousef Gregory

CPSO#: 85709

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universita Palackeho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416)242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yousef Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 85709 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YOUSEF GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012