skip to content

Papadopoulos, Yasmin Anna

CPSO#: 85710

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universita Palackeho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 302
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 445-9673
Fax: (416) 445-9388 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fieldstone Commons LTC
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Canada
Phone: (416) 445-9673
Fax: (416) 445-9388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

130 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1N 4B2
Canada
Phone: 416 264-2301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Chartwell Trilegy LTC
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Canada
Phone: 416 443-1074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2111 Finch Ave. W
Toronto ON  M3N 1N1
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yasmin Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 85710 )

Business Address:
130 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1N 4B2
Phone Number: (416) 264-2301

Business Address:
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 443-1074

Business Address:
One Medical Place
302 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 445-9673

Business Address:
Leisureworld
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Phone Number: (416) 291-0222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASMIN ANNA PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Jan 2009 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009