skip to content

Papa, Fabio de Vasconcelos

CPSO#: 90082

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2011