skip to content

Papa, Fabio de Vasconcelos

CPSO#: 90082

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow) as of 13 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FABIO DE VASCONCELOS PAPA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PAPA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. PAPA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PAPA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PAPA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. PAPA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. PAPA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022