skip to content

Panu, Anukul

CPSO#: 96235

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11010 101 ST NW
Edmonton AB  T5H 4B9
Phone: 780-426-1121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUKUL PANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013