skip to content

Pannell, Dylan Geoffrey

CPSO#: 86882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Suite H186
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5255
Fax: (416) 480-5499 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Williams-Pannell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Williams ( CPSO# 81058 )
Dr. D. Pannell ( CPSO# 86882 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DYLAN GEOFFREY PANNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009