skip to content

Pang, Mee Wan Susan

CPSO#: 31350

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Feb 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: MWS Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Humber River Regional Hospital 1235 Wilson Ave Toronto, ON M3M 0B2 or Ellesmere Medical Management Inc. 520 Ellesmere Rd Scarborough, ON M1R 0B1
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019