skip to content

Pan, Wen-Mei

CPSO#: 23273

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
03 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Pembrooke Regional Hospital Medical Records Department 705 MacKay St. Pembroke, ON K8A 1G8
Date Received: 08 Jul 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:20 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 2020