skip to content

Palmgren, Elisabeth

CPSO#: 26206

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Swedish

Education:Royal Caroline Medico-Surgical Institute, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013