skip to content

Paley, Dror

CPSO#: 31990

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Italian, Russian, Spanish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paley Orthopedic & Spine
Institute
Kimmel Building
901 45th Street
West Palm Beach FL  33407
United States
Phone: (561) 844-5255
Fax: (561) 844-5245

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DROR PALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010