skip to content

Palermo, Eligio

CPSO#: 29999

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 26 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Southlake RHC 596 Davis Drive Newmarket ON L3Y2P9
Date Received: 30 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Apr 2019