skip to content

Paina, Mihaela

CPSO#: 100408

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Romanian

Education:Universitatea Iuliu Hatieganu, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1730 Bishop St N
Unit 1
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N4
Phone: (519) 578-1500
Fax: (519) 800-3732 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Canada
Phone: (519) 896-6699
Fax: (519) 279-1585
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 13 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIHAELA PAINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2018 to 06 May 2018
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017