skip to content

Pahuta, Markian Andrew

CPSO#: 88836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Orthopaedic Surgery
5 North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 46611
Fax: 905-527-6214 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.A. Pahuta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARKIAN ANDREW PAHUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAHUTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015